Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Goldberg, Jeremy (CPSO#: 62957)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton West 5th Campus 100 West 5th Street Hamilton ON L8N 3K7, Ron Joyce 325 Wellington Street North Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jul 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017