Goldberg, Michael Richard (CPSO#: 23397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 05 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2015