Goldberg, Orli Dawn (CPSO#: 80727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forest Hill Family Health Centre
Suite 200
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 782-6111
Fax: (416) 782-5515
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Y. Baratz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Goldberg ( CPSO# 80727 )
Dr. A. Baratz ( CPSO# 76552 )

Business Address:
Create Fertility Centre
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (413) 323-7727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORLI DAWN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006