Goldberg, Ronn Elliott Aron (CPSO#: 33629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 6186
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 4164948800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.E.A. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldberg ( CPSO# 33629 )
Dr. S. Weinstock-Goldberg ( CPSO# 59296 )

Business Address:
800 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3M8
Phone Number: (416) 531-1128

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
3292 Bayview Avenue
Suite 206-207
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (647) 427-0195

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-4884

Business Address:
1450 O'Connor Building 1
Scarborough ON  M4B 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 759-3223

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Business Address:
403 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 636-5500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONN ELLIOTT ARON GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1988