Goldbloom, Alan Lloyd (CPSO#: 28175)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014