Goldbloom, Ellen Beth (CPSO#: 80883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Div of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room 5109 C 5th Floor West
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3939
Fax: 613-738-4236
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN BETH GOLDBLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBLOOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010