Goldchtaub, Valeri Valerievich (CPSO#: 82071)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Semipalatinsk State Medical Academy, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 03 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2008