Golde, Andrew Robert (CPSO#: 59874)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Latvian

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2009