Goldenberg, Donna Ann (CPSO#: 58474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone: (905) 569-9798
Fax: (905) 569-8630
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna A. Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goldenberg ( CPSO# 58474 )

Business Address:
301 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-9798

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA ANN GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1989