Goldenberg, Lesley Peace (CPSO#: 52992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 303 C
Toronto ON  M4R 1A3
Phone: (416) 928-6599
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY PEACE GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985