Goldenberg, Leslie Mark Cooper (CPSO#: 28995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walking Mobility Clinics
Unit 9
1084 Salk Road
Pickering ON  L1W 4B6
Phone: (905) 420-1015
Fax: (905) 420-8803
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Walking Mobility Clinic
750 Dundas Street West
Suite 11
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-1015
Fax: (416) 929-9918
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Walking Mobility Clinic
750 Dundas St. W, Unit 11
Toronto ON  M5T-2S6
Canada
Phone: 416-929-1015
Fax: 416-929-9918
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie M. Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Goldenberg ( CPSO# 28995 )

Business Address:
750 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Phone Number: (416) 929-1015

Business Address:
9 - 1084 Salk Road
Pickering ON  L1W 4B6
Phone Number: (905) 420-1015

Business Address:
202 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4A5
Phone Number: (905) 770-1015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE MARK COOPER GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1977