Goldenberg, Louis Milton (CPSO#: 10659)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1936

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1944 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1938
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 1991