Goldenberg, Ronald Michael (CPSO#: 54128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 17
531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Fax: (905) 763-0708
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldenberg ( CPSO# 54128 )

Business Address:
Unit 17
531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone Number: (905) 763-8660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD MICHAEL GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985