Goldenthal, Nathan David (CPSO#: 28700)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001