Goldfarb, Bernard (CPSO#: 59681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Adult And Pediatric Urology
Canada Place Building
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 474-0992
Fax: (705) 474-1148
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Goldfarb ( CPSO# 59681 )

Business Address:
Canada Place Building
Adult and Pediatric Urology
Unit 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone Number: (705) 474-0992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989