Goldfarb, Cynthia Ellen (CPSO#: 61117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5734 Yonge St, suite 500
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 224-5959
Fax: (416) 224-2772
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David R. Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goldfarb ( CPSO# 61117 )
Dr. D. Goldfarb ( CPSO# 55729 )

Business Address:
402 - 685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 549-5558

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ELLEN GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991