Goldfarb, Peter (CPSO#: 28332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 Laird Dr Suite 201
Toronto ON  M4G3T7
Phone: 416-445-4459
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976