Goldfinger, Morris (CPSO#: 30126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5003
16 Harbour Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Z7
Phone: (647) 330-2887
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

B1-600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 968-1360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goldfinger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldfinger ( CPSO# 30126 )

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7

Business Address:
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite B1, B7 & B6
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4

Business Address:
Suite 5003
16 Harbour Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Z7
Phone Number: (647) 330-2887

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]


            As  from  August  9,  2013,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Morris Goldfinger, in
            accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Goldfinger  to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Goldfinger  has  voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges
                  and undertaken not to prescribe any medications whatsoever.
                  
                  
            In  resolution of the Registrar's  investigation  of  Dr.  Morris  Goldfinger's
            Computed  Tomography  (CT)  diagnostic  imaging practice, Dr. Morris Goldfinger
            undertakes, as from July 28, 2005, to do the following:

                  (1)   To cease the practice of all CT activities (including conducting CT
                        radiologic examinations and reading, interpreting, and reporting CT
                        radiologic examinations) immediately.
                  
                  (2)   Not to recommence any CT practice.