Goldie, Steven Louis (CPSO#: 103357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: 519-204-3122
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Goldie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goldie ( CPSO# 103357)

Business Address:
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LOUIS GOLDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016