Golding, Ian Fraser (CPSO#: 68840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6140
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN FRASER GOLDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2000