Goldlist, Barry Joseph (CPSO#: 27370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 422
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6641
Fax: (416) 586-8327
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Goldlist Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Goldlist ( CPSO# 27370 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 422
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY JOSEPH GOLDLIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDLIST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975