Goldman, Faye Andrea (CPSO#: 63852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carling Broadview Medical Building
Suite 305
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-7700
Fax: (613) 728-5848
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAYE ANDREA GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992