Goldman, Howard Brian (CPSO#: 33049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Brian Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Goldman ( CPSO# 33049 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD BRIAN GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1982