Goldman, Lorne Eric (CPSO#: 69855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Goldman ( CPSO# 69855 )

Business Address:
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE ERIC GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 May 1996 to 14 Jun 1996
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2000