Goldman, Mindy Rona (CPSO#: 58788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 4J5
Phone: (613) 739-2577
Fax: (613) 739-2002
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINDY RONA GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989