Goldman, Sidney Bernard (CPSO#: 17925)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Division of Cardiac Surgery 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 15 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017