Goldsand, John Ira (CPSO#: 59905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 724
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 927-7321
Fax: 4169279984
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: 4165973422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sinai Health System - Bridgepoint
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8252
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Goldsand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goldsand ( CPSO# 59905 )

Business Address:
Suite 724
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 927-7321

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Health
14 St Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8251

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN IRA GOLDSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1989