Goldstein, Allan Sandor (CPSO#: 28729)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008