Goldstein, David Howard (CPSO#: 61640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
75 Charles Street
Brockville
Brockville ON  K6V 1S5
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goldstein ( CPSO# 61640 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S5
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HOWARD GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991