Goldstein, Mark Larry (CPSO#: 58299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-1150
Fax: (416) 256-0742
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark L. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldstein ( CPSO# 58299 )

Business Address:
401 - 960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-1150

Business Address:
Hellenic Home
215 Tyrrel Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 4A9

Business Address:
The O'Neill Centre
33 Christie Street
Toronto ON  M6G 3B1

Business Address:
Thompson House
1 Overland Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 2C3

Business Address:
Kensington Gardens
25 & 45 Brunswick Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2K1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK LARRY GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988