Goldszmidt, Eric (CPSO#: 69929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue #19-105
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth St. EN437
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-5164
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2347 Kennedy Rd Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-1010
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

340 College St. Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Goldszmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Goldszmidt ( CPSO# 69929 )

Business Address:
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
19-105 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
EN437
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC GOLDSZMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSZMIDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001