Goldszmidt, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 69930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 35995
Fax: (519) 663-3062
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark A. Goldszmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldszmidt ( CPSO# 69930 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Health Sciences Addition
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW GOLDSZMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSZMIDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000