Goldthorpe, Wilfred Gary (CPSO#: 18402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Goldthorpe PO Box 2094 789 Drayton Road Sioux Lookout, Ontario P8T 1J7
Date Received: 20 Jan 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Nov 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009