Golev, Dmitry Sergeyevich (CPSO#: 86896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42562
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dmitry Golev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Golev ( CPSO# 86896 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
Hamilton Health Sciences
Radiology Department
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DMITRY SERGEYEVICH GOLEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012