Gollant, Jerod Allan (CPSO#: 82921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2110
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

57 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9955 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerod Gollant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gollant ( CPSO# 82921 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
9955 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M6
Phone Number: (289) 809-0993

Business Address:
57 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1G2
Phone Number: (905) 881-2393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROD ALLAN GOLLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLLANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010