Gollob, Michael Howard (CPSO#: 68262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 GW 560
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4282
Fax: (416) 340-3281
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gollob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gollob ( CPSO# 68262 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Room 3 GW 360
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOWARD GOLLOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLLOB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2004