Golshan, Ashkan (CPSO#: 76422)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashkan Golshan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2015