Golts, Marianna (CPSO#: 79375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4542
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Golts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Golts ( CPSO# 79375 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNA GOLTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008