Goluch, Richard John (CPSO#: 52789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7007
Fax: (705) 523-7161
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Goluch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goluch ( CPSO# 52789 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN GOLUCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLUCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985