Gomez Jaramillo, David (CPSO#: 95829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Donnelly Wing Room 3-074B
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GOMEZ JARAMILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ JARAMILLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017