Gomez Ospina, Manuel (CPSO#: 68663)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1975

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 1997