Gomez Torres, Jeisa Yomary (CPSO#: 108133)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Puerto Rico
USA - Washington

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017