Gomez-Ibanez, Asier (CPSO#: 99801)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Navarra, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 27 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Feb 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2014