Gomez-Mancilla, Baltazar (CPSO#: 67285)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997