Goncalves, Andrea Teixeira Cadaval (CPSO#: 86292)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012