Goncalves, Maria Joana (CPSO#: 65019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Vieira, Maria Joana Goncalves (used until: 04 Jan 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Lisboa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
622 College Street
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6G 1B6
Phone: (416) 533-8486
Fax: (416) 533-0114
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 308
622 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B6
Canada
Phone: (416) 531-1244
Fax: (416) 533-0114
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joana Goncalves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goncalves ( CPSO# 65019 )

Business Address:
622 College Street
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M5G 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 533-8486

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA JOANA GONCALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONCALVES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)