Gonsalves, Patrick Mark (CPSO#: 84732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
157 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3609 Sheppard Ave E.
Unit 202
Scarborough ON  M1T 3K8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

345 Bloor Street East #4A
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonsalves and Best Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Best ( CPSO# 86753 )
Dr. P. Gonsalves ( CPSO# 84732 )

Business Address:
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
Suite 4A
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK MARK GONSALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSALVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008