Gonser, Randal James (CPSO#: 52663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Fax: (519) 273-3208
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randal Gonser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonser ( CPSO# 52663 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 273-4100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDAL JAMES GONSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985