Gonska, Tanja Yvette (CPSO#: 82291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2010

Expiry Date:  03 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2164
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 23 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tanja Yvette Gonska may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   Division   of   Gastroenterology,   Hepatology   and
                        Nutrition,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Gonska holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  expire on the  earlier  of  the
                  following times: 

                  (i)   on November 3, 2019,
                  
                  (ii)  when  Dr. Gonska no longer holds the academic  appointment  at  the
                  rank of AssistantProfessor  in the Department of Paediatrics, Division of
                  Gastroenterology, Hepatology and Nutrition, University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a decision about Dr. Gonska's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Gonska's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on November 4, 2010.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 3, 2019.