Gonu, Crystal Joy (CPSO#: 94507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: Baker, Crystal Joy (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit B
Suite C 01
310 Bridge Street
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-9648
Fax: (613) 354-7435
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Gonu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gonu ( CPSO# 94507 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Unit B
Suite C 01
310 Bridge Street
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-9648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL JOY GONU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012